TN HB0564 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 25 @ 2:30 pm in House Hearing Room II
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a local board of education to make payroll deduction for dues of professional employees' organizations available to its professional employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes a local board of education to make payroll deduction for dues of professional employees' organizations available to its professional employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0482 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback