TN HB0564 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes counties to grant a 50 percent discount on motor vehicle privilege taxes for United States armed forces and National Guard active and reserve members. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes counties to grant a 50 percent discount on motor vehicle privilege taxes for United States armed forces and National Guard active and reserve members. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1332 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-15 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation