TN HB0563 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any nonprofit entering into an agreement with the department on or after July 1, 2013, for the purpose of providing marketing or advertising services through broadcasting to provide such services at a discounted rate or otherwise the agreement shall be null and void. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 20 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, requires any nonprofit entering into an agreement with the department on or after July 1, 2013, for the purpose of providing marketing or advertising services through broadcasting to provide such services at a discounted rate or otherwise the agreement shall be null and void. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 20 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Withdrawn. |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0863 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0563&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0563.pdf |