TN HB0562 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that compensation for members of the national guard must accrue upon them being ordered to active state service and the payment of compensation to members must use this state's established weekly pay cycle as needed to effectuate compensation. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 1, relative to military pay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADJOURN (Y: 22 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADJOURN (Y: 22 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 360 | |
2023-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0398) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0061) |
2023-03-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/2/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1463 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360