TN HB0560 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "No Investment in Iran Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 24; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37; Title 8, Chapter 5 and Title 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "No Investment in Iran Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 24; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37; Title 8, Chapter 5 and Title 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-18 Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
2009-02-12 P2C, ref. to Finance
2009-02-11 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-10 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0484 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback