TN HB0558 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an LEA or public charter school to allow a student to be absent from school for one full school day each year to allow the student time to address the student's mental or behavioral health. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-08 - Deferred to Summer Study