TN HB0557 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a person or entity holding a retail package store license, liquor-by-the-drink license, or retail food store wine license to sell or transfer the person's or entity's inventory of alcoholic beverages or wine, as applicable, upon the sale or closure of the establishment to another licensee if certain requirements are met. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 8 and Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 2; Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 8 and Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 1, relative to the transfer of alcoholic beverage inventory.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2021 | |
2021-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 76 | |
2021-03-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 79, Nays 6, PNV 4 |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0591 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 76