TN HB0556 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the nursing home annual assessment fee to June 30, 2022; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to the nursing home assessment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 530
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-25 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-05-03SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-05-03SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0299)
2021-05-03SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-05-03HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-05-03HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 2
2021-05-03HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0231)
2021-04-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-20HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1276 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback