TN HB0553 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the Initiative on HBCUs to focus on ways to support programs and initiatives that will increase the number of graduates from HBCUs in the state; authorizes the initiative to consult with the Consortium of Historically Black Colleges and Universities to ensure the initiative meets its goal. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-733 and Title 49, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the Initiative on HBCUs to focus on ways to support programs and initiatives that will increase the number of graduates from HBCUs in the state; authorizes the initiative to consult with the Consortium of Historically Black Colleges and Universities to ensure the initiative meets its goal. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-733 and Title 49, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-23HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-09SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-05-09SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0541)
2017-05-09SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0073)
2017-05-09SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-05-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 1
2017-05-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0076)
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017
2017-05-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/14/2017
2017-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/7/2017
2017-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/21/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-07HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0562 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback