TN HB0551 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a tiered essential wage for workers deemed essential starting at $15 per hour and increasing to $20 per hour by July 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 50 and Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50 and Title 58, relative to essential workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0420 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee