TN HB0551 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Facilitating Business Rapid Response to State Declared Disaster Act." - Amends TCA Title 58; Title 62; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Facilitating Business Rapid Response to State Declared Disaster Act." - Amends TCA Title 58; Title 62; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 378 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0624 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 378