TN HB0549 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the estate of a deputy jailer of a local government who is killed in the line of duty to receive an annuity in the amount of $250,000, paid over five years in $50,000 installments. - Amends TCA Section 7-51-210.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 7-51-210, relative to compensation for the death of emergency responders in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Effective date(s) 03/11/2022 | |
2022-03-23 | Pub. Ch. 646 | |
2022-03-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0378) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0246) |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0278 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 646