TN HB0545 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 21 to 30 the number of calendar days within which a person granted an order of protection may apply for a temporary handgun carry permit from the department of safety after an order of protection has been granted. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, increases from 21 to 30 the number of calendar days within which a person granted an order of protection may apply for a temporary handgun carry permit from the department of safety after an order of protection has been granted. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY BOYD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY BOYD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY HULSEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 42 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY BOYD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY BOYD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY HULSEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 42 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 61, Nays 30, PNV 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0146) |
2019-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0268) |
2019-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0257) |
2019-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0222) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/19 |
2019-04-04 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/8/19 |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1401 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.