TN HB0545 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a public school from being a member of an organization that regulates interscholastic athletic events, if the organization allows home school students to participate on public or private school sports teams based on the type of home school attended. - Amends TCA Section 49-50-801 and Section 49-6-3050.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a public school from being a member of an organization that regulates interscholastic athletic events, if the organization allows home school students to participate on public or private school sports teams based on the type of home school attended. - Amends TCA Section 49-50-801 and Section 49-6-3050.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-12HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2015-02-12HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2015-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0458 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback