TN HB0544 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 584
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes provisions governing specific service signs where more than six businesses of a specific service type are eligible for sign panels. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, relative to specific service signs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 584 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0267 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021