TN HB0540 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2019
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 2:00 pm in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the date by which persons who sell certificates of number for boats must remit revenue to the Tennessee fish and wildlife commission from the 10th day after the first of the month to the 14th day after the first of the month. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes the date by which persons who sell certificates of number for boats must remit revenue to the Tennessee fish and wildlife commission from the 10th day after the first of the month to the 14th day after the first of the month. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRef. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0857 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback