TN HB0535 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Education Instruction Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Education Instruction Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the time in which a parent representative must be appointed to the governing body of a charter school from within six months of the school's opening date to within 90 days of the school's opening date. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 13, relative to the charter schools.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2021-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0455 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-17 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0