TN HB0535 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a streamlined process for certain public officials to contest Uniform Commercial Code financing statements that they believe to lack any legal basis. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 9, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, creates a streamlined process for certain public officials to contest Uniform Commercial Code financing statements that they believe to lack any legal basis. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 9, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass if am; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0726 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 406