TN HB0534 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Class A misdemeanor of communicating a threat to commit an act of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity; creates the Class B misdemeanor of knowing failure to report a threat of mass violence on school property or at a school-related activity. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 37 and Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 5, relative to school violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 395 | |
2021-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0627 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 395