TN HB0531 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that when members of the Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System elect to establish retirement service through monthly installments, the members can do so over the length of service being established. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37, relative to retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 251 | |
2021-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0405 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021