TN HB0531 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes permanent the provision that is set to expire July 1, 2019, allowing counties to provide 2 percent matching funds for state-aid highway funds rather than 25 percent. - Amends TCA Section 54-4-404.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes permanent the provision that is set to expire July 1, 2019, allowing counties to provide 2 percent matching funds for state-aid highway funds rather than 25 percent. - Amends TCA Section 54-4-404.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 129
2019-03-25HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/12/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1364 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 129

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback