TN HB0531 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-14)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-14)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the Tennessee reconnect grant. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, enacts the Tennessee reconnect grant. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 448 | |
2017-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2017; 08/01/2018 | |
2017-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-10 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 81, Nays 3 PNV 0 HB0531 |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0544) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0096) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 6, PNV 1 |
2017-04-13 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0051) |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1218 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 448