TN HB0530 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-9)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-9)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the Tennessee National Guard Tuition Assistance Act with the Tennessee Support, Training, and Renewing Opportunity for National Guardsmen (STRONG) Act of 2017. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, replaces the Tennessee National Guard Tuition Assistance Act with the Tennessee Support, Training, and Renewing Opportunity for National Guardsmen (STRONG) Act of 2017. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 229 | |
2017-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1216 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 229