TN HB0528 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing temporary teaching permits. - Amends TCA Section 49-5-106.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-5-106, relative to temporary teaching permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 211 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1133 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021