TN HB0527 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends and revises the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 55; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, extends and revises the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 55; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188 | |
2019-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1349 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 188