TN HB0524 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 498
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Regional Retail Tourism Development District Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Regional Retail Tourism Development District Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 47; Title 48; Title 61 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 498 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | S. Amendment #2 withdrawn. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to reconsider S. Am #2 adopted. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Tabling Motion Lifted. |
2019-05-02 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3 Ayes 76, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-05-02 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 2 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reset on next available calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0462) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0461) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0363) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0503) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0483) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1434 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 498