TN HB0521 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the professional music therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of music therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 11, relative to music therapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Aftyn Behn [D] |
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with a Negative Recommendation |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | No Action Taken |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0898 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.