TN HB0519 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a firefighter's cancer that causes a disabling health condition is a result of the firefighter's duties as a firefighter. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a firefighter's cancer that causes a disabling health condition is a result of the firefighter's duties as a firefighter. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0438 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee