TN HB0519 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 319
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 319
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits contributions from PACs after the 10th day before an election to coincide with reporting date of pre-primary and pre-general election statements. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-117.
Title
As enacted, prohibits contributions from PACs after the 10th day before an election to coincide with reporting date of pre-primary and pre-general election statements. - Amends TCA Section 2-10-117.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Pub. Ch. 319 | |
2009-06-05 | Effective date(s) 05/27/09 | |
2009-05-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-05-18 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-18 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-04-16 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-04-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-13 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/13/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/09/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Elections of S&LG to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0139 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 319
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0519&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0519.pdf |