TN HB0518 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Failed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a program managed by the commissioner of commerce and insurance to annually award grants to volunteer fire departments for the purchase of firefighting equipment or to meet local match requirements for federal grants for the purchase of firefighting equipment and training. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a program managed by the commissioner of commerce and insurance to annually award grants to volunteer fire departments for the purchase of firefighting equipment or to meet local match requirements for federal grants for the purchase of firefighting equipment and training. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-02HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 95, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0518
2019-05-02HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/2/19
2019-05-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0451)
2019-05-01SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-30HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-01HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2019
2019-03-28HouseR/S Ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-19HouseFailed for lack of second in: Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1395 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback