TN HB0517 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the speakers of the house of representatives and the senate to appoint a committee to study managed care organizations and this state's expenditures on services for patients in areas of care, including a review of the expenditures for similar services in other state medicaid programs; requires the committee to submit a report to the governor and the members of the general assembly by January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the speakers of the house of representatives and the senate to appoint a committee to study managed care organizations and this state's expenditures on services for patients in areas of care, including a review of the expenditures for similar services in other state medicaid programs; requires the committee to submit a report to the governor and the members of the general assembly by January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-12HouseReassigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0387 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback