TN HB0513 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for obstructing a highway from a Class B or C misdemeanor to a Class E felony and makes other related changes; creates the offense of throwing an object at another while participating in a riot; creates the offense of intimidating or harassing another while participating in a riot. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 39; Title 40; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 39; Title 40; Title 54 and Title 55, relative to criminal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 23, PNV 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-05 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0446) |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | House | Reset on cal. for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/5/21 |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0843 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Deferred to Summer Study