TN HB0512 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a person convicted of attempted first degree murder to be sentenced to imprisonment for life without possibility of parole if the offense is committed against certain persons engaged in the performance of official duties. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to sentencing of attempted first degree murder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 394 | |
2021-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 5 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0363) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0015) |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0842 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 394