TN HB0510 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Innovation FastTrack Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 1; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56, Chapter 1; Title 62 and Title 63, relative to innovations.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0899 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee