TN HB0501 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds funding for three Response to Instruction and Intervention positions within each public school to the BEP calculation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, adds funding for three Response to Instruction and Intervention positions within each public school to the BEP calculation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/20/2018 |
2017-03-28 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0481 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee