TN HB0496 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates exemptions to licensure and certification requirements, as applicable, for certain health professionals who are participating in federal Innovative Readiness Training programs. - Amends TCA Title 58 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates exemptions to licensure and certification requirements, as applicable, for certain health professionals who are participating in federal Innovative Readiness Training programs. - Amends TCA Title 58 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-08HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0053 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback