TN HB0495 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relative to agency rules scheduled to expire pursuant to the provisions of the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act, compiled in Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1076 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021