TN HB0487 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes amusement tax on dues or fees to membership sports and recreation clubs. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes amusement tax on dues or fees to membership sports and recreation clubs. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
2018-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-28HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-03-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2017-05-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-06HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1234 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback