TN HB0487 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a seller of antiques, used or scrap jewelry, and precious metals to provide the seller’s actual address, not mailing address, in transaction records. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1, Part 2 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, requires a seller of antiques, used or scrap jewelry, and precious metals to provide the seller’s actual address, not mailing address, in transaction records. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 1, Part 2 and Title 62.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0498 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0487&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0487.pdf |