TN HB0487 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows the respondent in a contested case to continue the date of the first scheduled hearing until both parties certify that they are ready for the hearing; allows either party to make a motion to set the hearing if unreasonable delay occurs. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, allows the respondent in a contested case to continue the date of the first scheduled hearing until both parties certify that they are ready for the hearing; allows either party to make a motion to set the hearing if unreasonable delay occurs. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Action Def. in s/c General Sub of Judiciary to 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Judiciary for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0796 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0487&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0487.pdf |