TN HB0485 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Eddie Conrad Act," which establishes the number of points to be charged to a person's driving record for violations of driving while using a wireless telecommunications device. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-199.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 55-8-199, relative to traffic safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 428 | |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Special Driver's License Calendar |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0589 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2024