TN HB0485 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee board of judicial conduct to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee board of judicial conduct to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406 | |
2019-05-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Final Calendar for 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0153 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 406