TN HB0483 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the Tennessee Technological University, board of trustees to June 30, 2021; creates a separate sunset provision for the university. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the Tennessee Technological University, board of trustees to June 30, 2021; creates a separate sunset provision for the university. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0151 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-07 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback