TN HB0480 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires managed care organizations participating in the TennCare program to annually report to the bureau of TennCare certain information regarding treatment of claims for mental health and alcoholism or drug dependence benefits in relation to the requirements of the Paul Wellstone and Pete Domenici Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires managed care organizations participating in the TennCare program to annually report to the bureau of TennCare certain information regarding treatment of claims for mental health and alcoholism or drug dependence benefits in relation to the requirements of the Paul Wellstone and Pete Domenici Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act of 2008. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Gerald McCormick [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 221 | |
2017-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0837 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 221