TN HB0478 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, eliminates the 30-day aggregate limit of sick leave that may be used for maternity and paternity leave if both parents are state employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8.
Title
As enacted, eliminates the 30-day aggregate limit of sick leave that may be used for maternity and paternity leave if both parents are state employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 78 | |
2015-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-12 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Finance |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0950 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 78