TN HB0476 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits insurers doing business in this state under insurance law from participating in American Health Benefit Exchanges or any other health insurance exchange operated in this state under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, prohibits insurers doing business in this state under insurance law from participating in American Health Benefit Exchanges or any other health insurance exchange operated in this state under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-01-21 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to last calendar |
2014-01-15 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 1/21/2014 |
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to first calendar of 2014 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to last calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0666 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Failed in S. C&L Comm. ayes 1, nays 2, PNV 4