TN HB0476 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that a law enforcement officer from another state does not have immunity or the power to arrest in this state when in fresh pursuit of suspect unless the officer is in compliance with the pursuit policy of the jurisdiction in which the pursuit occurs. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 2 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, provides that a law enforcement officer from another state does not have immunity or the power to arrest in this state when in fresh pursuit of suspect unless the officer is in compliance with the pursuit policy of the jurisdiction in which the pursuit occurs. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 2 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 01/27/2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 2010 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1131 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0476&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0476.pdf |