TN HB0475 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits school child abuse coordinators, school teachers, school officials, and other school personnel to provide information relevant to suspected child abuse or child sexual abuse to the child's parents when required by federal law or regulation, the parent to whom the notification is made is not alleged to be the perpetrator or in any way complicit in the abuse or neglect, and the notification is done in conjunction with the department of children's services. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 16.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 16, relative to child abuse reporting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 161 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-18 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0124 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021