TN HB0473 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the private probation services council to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the private probation services council to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-22HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0141 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-28 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback