TN HB0471 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires THEC to include in its annual postsecondary education fact book a financial disclosure statement accounting for the collection and use of student activity fees; applies to public institutions of higher education operated by the board of regents or the UT board of trustees. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires THEC to include in its annual postsecondary education fact book a financial disclosure statement accounting for the collection and use of student activity fees; applies to public institutions of higher education operated by the board of regents or the UT board of trustees. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 429 |
2013-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0687 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 429